Williams v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Delmeka Williams
Defendant: Greyhound Lines Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. and Robert Tarlano
Case Number: 2:2019cv11989
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand to State Court and the matter is remanded to Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/26/19. (ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Remand Letter) (ko).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Delmeka Williams re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/19/19. (ko)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 REPLY to Response to Motion. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2. The motion for leave should have been filed as your main document. The proposed pleading and proposed order should have been filed as attachments to the motion. Clerk to corrective action. No further action is necessary.** (am)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Delmeka Williams re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Merritt, William) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019) (am). Modified text on 9/19/2019 (am).
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Parker, Hearl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Delmeka Williams. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Notice of Submission)(Merritt, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Greyhound Lines Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Parker, Hearl) Modified text/link on 8/15/2019 (sa).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. identifying Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Parker, Hearl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Greyhound Lines Inc identifying Corporate Parent FirstGroup American Investments, Corporate Parent FirstGroup US Holdings, Corporate Parent Laidlaw Transportation, Inc., Corporate Parent FirstGroup International, Inc., Corporate Parent FirstGroup America, Inc., Corporate Parent Laidlaw Transportation Holdings, Inc. for Greyhound Lines Inc (Parker, Hearl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-5573 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7784459) filed by Greyhound Lines Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #4 Exhibit List of Attorneys/Parties)Attorney Hearl James Parker added to party Greyhound Lines Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Hearl James Parker added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.(pty:dft).(Parker, Hearl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines Inc
Represented By: Hearl James Parker
Represented By: Kyle Demoine' Anderson
Represented By: Meredith Anne Mayberry
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
Represented By: Hearl James Parker
Represented By: Kyle Demoine' Anderson
Represented By: Rachal Chance Kramar
Represented By: Leslie Elizabeth Knowles
Represented By: Meredith Anne Mayberry
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tarlano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmeka Williams
Represented By: William Gregory Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?