Doe v. Cola et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Monique Cola, Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc. d/b/a/ New Orleans Charter Science and Mathematics High School and Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv12003
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants by John Doe. (Jones, Ernest) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (jls).
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Buckingham, Jennifer)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 2:00 PM, Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 9:00 AM. All discovery must be completed by 3/12/2020.Issued by Clerk for Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(jls)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/10/2019 at 2:45 PM before case manager by telephone. Issued by Clerk.(jls)
August 31, 2019 Filing 11 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Doe. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Jones, Ernest) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 2:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(jls)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Attorney Mark R. Pharr, III and Jennifer R. Buckingham are substituted for Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc. and Monique Cola in place of Kellen James Mathews, Lauren Lopresto Tafaro, Jennifer Claire Bergeron, and Jaimme A. Collins. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/2019. (jls)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance by Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc, Monique Cola State Court Pleadings and Service (Buckingham, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc, Monique Cola List of State Court Filings (Buckingham, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc, Monique Cola List of All Parties and Service (Buckingham, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark R. Pharr and Jennifer Buckingham to be substituted in place of Lauren Tafaro, Jaimme Collins, Kellen Matthews and Jennifer Bergeron by Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc, Monique Cola. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jennifer Rohrback Buckingham added to party Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Rohrback Buckingham added to party Monique Cola(pty:dft).(Buckingham, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld is no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 8/7/2019. (NEF: Judge North)(ajn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Monique Cola. (clw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2019-7848 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7786023) filed by Monique Cola, Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc. d/b/a/ New Orleans Charter Science and Mathematics High School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notie of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kellen James Mathews added to party Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc. d/b/a/ New Orleans Charter Science and Mathematics High School (pty:dft), Attorney Kellen James Mathews added to party Monique Cola(pty:dft).(Mathews, Kellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Cola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Cola
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jennifer Rohrback Buckingham
Represented By: Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Represented By: Jaimme A. Collins
Represented By: Jennifer Claire Bergeron
Represented By: Mark R. Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc. d/b/a/ New Orleans Charter Science and Mathematics High School
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocates for Science and Mathematics Education, Inc
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jennifer Rohrback Buckingham
Represented By: Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Represented By: Jaimme A. Collins
Represented By: Jennifer Claire Bergeron
Represented By: Mark R. Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Michael G. Bagneris
Represented By: Ernest Lake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?