Donovan v. Herman
Plaintiff: Brian J. Donovan
Defendant: Stephen J. Herman
Case Number: 2:2019cv12014
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013. (gec)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, & #41 2nd Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended) (gec)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-00623. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (gec)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Eastern District of Louisiana re: MDL case number: 2179. (AG) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS report (JOINT) by Stephen J. Herman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit C)(Jones, Richard) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Brian J. Donovan Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate CTO-139 with JPML (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3)(Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status report by May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/16/2019. (Covington, Virginia) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Brian J. Donovan Notice of Filing of Motion to Vacate CTO-139 and Brief with JPML (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate CTO-139, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion Requesting Total MDL 2179 PSC Compensation)(Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brian J. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - MDL 2179 Fee and Cost Committee Recommendation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Memo Requesting Total MDL 2179 PSC Compensation)(Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. The parties are diverse and the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Removal was proper. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/11/2019. (Covington, Virginia) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Stephen J. Herman. (Jones, Richard) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE canceling Case Management Hearing, Motion re #7 First Motion to remand to State Court, and #11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim hearing scheduled for 4/17/2019 at 1:30 PM. (TWL) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stephen J. Herman. Related case(s): Yes (Klein, Robert) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: A conditional transfer order has on today's date been entered by the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Thus, the Court cancels the hearing scheduled in this case and awaits transfer of this matter. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/4/2019. (Covington, Virginia) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Hearing, Motion re #7 First Motion to remand to State Court, and #11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim set for April 17, 2019, at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, Lead Counsel must appear in person at the Case Management Hearing. Lead Counsel must be prepared to discuss the claims and defenses as well as any unique aspects of the case with the Court. This hearing is an investment of the Court's time and presents an opportunity for Counsel to meet the judge presiding over their case as well as present any issues that should be called to the Court's attention. (TWL) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian J. Donovan. Related case(s): no (Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Stephen J. Herman. (Jones, Richard) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Klein, Robert) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stephen J. Herman. (Klein, Robert) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Order by Brian J. Donovan. (Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to remand to State Court by Brian J. Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Tag-Along Action)(Donovan, Brian) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/21/2019. (TWL) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by March 29, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/15/2019. (KAK) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting (Doc. #3 ) Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's response to the Complaint is due on April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/15/2019. (KAK) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Stephen J. Herman. (Klein, Robert) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-623-T-33TGW. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit Court Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-001530 filed in State Court on 02-12-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15233800 filed by Stephen J Herman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klein, Robert) Modified document description and text on 3/14/2019 (KMM). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donovan v. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Herman
Represented By: Robert Michael Klein
Represented By: Richard M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Donovan
Represented By: Brian J. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?