Fennidy et al v. Christ the King Parish School et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Fennidy, Montrelle Fennidy, Toyonita Parquet, Gregory Davis and Stephen Fennidy, Sr.
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans, Dawn Swear Castillo, Christ the King Parish School, Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans and Christ the King Roman Catholic Church
Case Number: 2:2019cv12032
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference is set for Monday, 12/2/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. PLEASE BE PUNCTUAL. The required settlement memoranda, as set forth herein, are due no later than midnight on Monday, 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/18/2019.(ajn)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/18/2019. (sa)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that current proceedings and pending deadlines, including but not limited to defendants' answers, are hereby stayed and the matter is hereby closed administratively, to be reopened if necessary upon proper motion. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/18/2019. (sa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION to Expedite Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. ** Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay by Gregory Davis, Montrelle Fennidy, Stephen Fennidy, Sr, Toyonita Parquet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Boyle, Inemesit) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (pp).
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings by Gregory Davis, Montrelle Fennidy, Stephen Fennidy, Sr, Toyonita Parquet. (Attachments: #1Proposed order)(O'Boyle, Inemesit) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (pp).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Dawn Swear Castillo answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/22/19. (ko)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Christ the King Roman Catholic Church answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/22/19. (ko)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/22/19. (ko)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Documents should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking documents to document 1. (clw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Dawn Swear Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Arthur Bordelon added to party Dawn Swear Castillo(pty:dft).(Bordelon, Richard) Modified text/linkage on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Christ the King Parish School. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Arthur Bordelon added to party Christ the King Parish School(pty:dft).(Bordelon, Richard) Modified text/linkage on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Arthur Bordelon added to party The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans(pty:dft).(Bordelon, Richard) Modified text/linkage on 8/22/2019 (clw).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/9/2019. (NEF: District Judge, Magistrate Judge)(mm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dawn Swear Castillo, Christ the King Parish School, The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(pp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7789843) filed by Montrelle Fennidy, Stephen Fennidy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney James McClendon Williams added to party Montrelle Fennidy(pty:pla), Attorney James McClendon Williams added to party Stephen Fennidy(pty:pla).(Williams, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #6 Exhibit) (pp). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/7/2019) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennidy et al v. Christ the King Parish School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Swear Castillo
Represented By: Dylan Karl Knoll
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christ the King Parish School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans
Represented By: Dylan Karl Knoll
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christ the King Roman Catholic Church
Represented By: Dylan Karl Knoll
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Fennidy
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montrelle Fennidy
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyonita Parquet
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Davis
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Fennidy, Sr.
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?