Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. v. Gregory Swafford
Plaintiff: Graystar Mortgage LLC and Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C.
Defendant: Gregory Swafford
Consolidated Defendant: Swafford Family Trust
Consolidated Plaintiff: JB 430 Holdings
Case Number: 2:2019cv12129
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 MOTION for Leave to File, #29 Memorandum and #30 MOTION for Leave to File. ***Filing attorney did not correctly file #28 Motion for Leave to File. Rec. Docs. 29 (Reply Memorandum) and 30 (Proposed Order) should have been attached to the Motion for Leave to file, NOT filed separately. Clerk has attached the documents to Rec. Doc. 28 to make the filing whole. Rec. Docs. 29 and 30 have been marked filed in error. No further action is necessary. (Reference: 19-cv-12129)(ajn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR - CORRECTED AND ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 28*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File by Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. (Reference: 19-cv-12129)(Watts, Steven) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ajn).
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 ***FILED IN ERROR - CORRECTED AND ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 28*** MEMORANDUM filed by Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. re #28 MOTION for Leave to File . (Reference: 19-12129)(Watts, Steven) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ajn).
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File by Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 19-cv-12129)(Watts, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Order) (ajn). Modified text on 10/8/2019 to attach documents incorrectly filed as separate entries (ajn).
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by JB 430 Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit)(Reference: 19-12370)(Pfister, C.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 MOTION for New Trial. ***Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF. The Memorandum in Support and Notice of Submission should have been filed as attachment(s) to Motion. All future filings should be entered this way. ALSO, filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 10/30/2019. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary.*** (Reference: 19-12370)(ajn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for New Trial by Swafford Family Trust. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition and Motion for New Trial)(Reference: 19-cv-12370)(Swafford, Gregory) (Main Document 24 replaced on 10/8/2019) (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) (ajn). Modified text on 10/8/2019 correct submission date and split documents (ajn).
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Swafford Family Trust re #16 MOTION Order to Vacate Premises . (Reference: 19-cv-12370)(Swafford, Gregory)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Swafford Family Trust re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Reference: 19-cv-12129)(Swafford, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: A Status Conference was held on 10/1/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Swafford has until Friday, 10/4/2019 at 4:00 PM to file his Oppositions to the Plaintiff Graystar Mortgage's Motion to Remand to State Court, (Rec. Doc. 6), and the Plaintiff JB 430 Holdings' Motion to Vacate the Premises. (Rec Doc. 16). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Swafford has until Tuesday, 10/2/2019 at 12:00 PM to have his counsel file a motion to enroll as counsel. (Reference: All Cases)(ajn)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Status Conference set for 10/1/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/27/19.(Reference: all)(jrc)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Henry L. Klein terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/16/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(ajn)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Henry Klein as Attorney by Henry L. Klein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: all cases)Attorney Henry L. Klein added to party Henry L. Klein(pty:selreq).(Klein, Henry)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying #17 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/12/2019. (Reference: 19-12370)(ajn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing re #16 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP by JB 430 Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 19-12370)(Pfister, C.) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (ajn).
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP by JB 430 Holdings. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 19-12370)(Pfister, C.) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (ajn).
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP and #14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP. ***Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. Both motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.*** (Reference: 19-12370)(ajn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP by JB 430 Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 19-12370)(Pfister, C.) Modified text on 9/11/2019 to remove referral(ajn).
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 ***DEFICIENT*** MOTION Pursuant to Rule 7(B) of FRCP by JB 430 Holdings. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 19-12370)(Pfister, C.) Modified text on 9/11/2019 to correct event and remove referral (ajn).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The above matter is hereby CONSOLIDATED with 2:19-cv-12370-JCZ-JVM. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation ALL CASES if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/9/2019. (Ref: 19-12129, 19-12370)(ajn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. By Clerk.(jrc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT*** Amendment/Supplement to Document by Gregory Swafford (Swafford, Gregory) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ajn).
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Gregory Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gregory Swafford added to party Gregory Swafford(pty:dft).(Swafford, Gregory) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ajn).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. ***Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately.*** (ajn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. regarding #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ajn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 request oral argument)(Watts, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Gregory Swafford re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Klein, Henry)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(ajn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Removal by Gregory Swafford re (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings-Redacted, #2 State Court Pleadings)(Klein, Henry) Modified text on 8/15/2019-refiled Notice of Removal (ajn).
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, St, case number 2018-5065 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7799368) filed by Gregory Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Henry L. Klein added to party Gregory Swafford(pty:dft).(Klein, Henry) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. v. Gregory Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Swafford
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Represented By: Gregory Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graystar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C.
Represented By: Steven Alan Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Swafford Family Trust
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Represented By: Gregory Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: JB 430 Holdings
Represented By: C. Michael Pfister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?