Baker v. Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julie Baker
Defendant: Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama and Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC
Petitioner: Ms. Julie Baker
Case Number: 2:2019cv12132
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama identifying Corporate Parent American Homestar Corporation for Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama (Domingue, Lamont)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama.(Domingue, Lamont)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Dismiss Case by Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ronda McAllen, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Lamont P. Domingue added to party Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lamont P. Domingue added to party Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama(pty:dft).(Domingue, Lamont)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Ley, Jonathan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Ley, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly S. Rizzo be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/29/2019. (jls)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Kelly S. Rizzo as Attorney by Julie Baker. (Ley, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (jls).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jls)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Julie Baker filed by Julie Baker re #1 Complaint. (Ley, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Ley, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC and Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7801013) filed by Julie Baker. Attorney Jonathan E. Ley added to party Julie Baker(pty:pet).(Ley, Jonathan) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Homes, LLC of Alabama
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Housing Systems, LLC
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. Julie Baker
Represented By: Jonathan E. Ley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Baker
Represented By: Jonathan E. Ley
Represented By: Edward Lee Moreno
Represented By: John W. Redmann
Represented By: Kelly S. Rizzo
Represented By: Travis Jasper Causey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?