GBCap Fund, LP et al v. Mendy
Plaintiff: GBCap Fund, LP and Accolend, LLC
Defendant: Nia Mendy
Case Number: 2:2019cv12135
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nia Mendy served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Williams, DeWayne) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (cg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nia Mendy. (cg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons issued by All Plaintiffs for (Aaron, William) Modified on 8/16/2019 (cg).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee received from William D Aaron and Gianna LLC: $ 400 Receipt No LAE057349 (ess)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Miscellaneous Case Petition of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by GBCap Fund, LP, Accolend, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)Attorney William David Aaron, Jr added to party Accolend, LLC(pty:pet), Attorney William David Aaron, Jr added to party GBCap Fund, LP(pty:pet).(Aaron, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GBCap Fund, LP et al v. Mendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nia Mendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GBCap Fund, LP
Represented By: William David Aaron, Jr.
Represented By: Anna A. Rainer
Represented By: DeWayne Larry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accolend, LLC
Represented By: William David Aaron, Jr.
Represented By: Anna A. Rainer
Represented By: DeWayne Larry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?