Cleartrac, LLC et al v. Lanrick Contractors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cleartrac, LLC and Russell Kent Moore
Defendant: Lanrick Real Estate, LLC, Lanrick Contractors, LLC, Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC, Southeast Dirt, LLC, Hudson Holdings, LLC, Thomas P McKellar and Thomas P. McKellar
Case Number: 2:2019cv12137
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Lanrick Contractors, LLC re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(DiVittorio, Frank)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion. Defendants' #12 Rule 12(b) Motion shall be set for submission on 10/9/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/17/2019.(jls)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cleartrac, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit Cleartrac Corporate Documents)(McDonald, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion (Rec. Doc. 12) by Cleartrac, LLC, Russell Kent Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (jls).
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cleartrac, LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's State Court Pleadings Denying Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit Evidence of Defenants Avoiding Service, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Lanrick's Corporate Representative, #4 Exhibit State Court Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit State Court Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified text/filers on 9/11/2019 (jls).
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Substitute Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Cleartrac, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jls).
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT. MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cleartrac, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Cleartrac Corporate Documents, #3 Notice of Submission)(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2019 (pp).**
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case by Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC, Hudson Holdings, LLC, Lanrick Contractors, LLC, Lanrick Real Estate, LLC, Thomas P. McKellar, Southeast Dirt, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Statement on Selection of Submission Date)Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Hudson Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Lanrick Contractors, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Lanrick Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Thomas P. McKellar(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Southeast Dirt, LLC(pty:dft).(DiVittorio, Frank) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (pp).
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Southeast Dirt, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (pp).
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Thomas P. McKellar served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT SUMMONS Returned Executed; Southeast Dirt, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (pp).**
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Lanrick Real Estate, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hudson Holdings, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Lanrick Contractors, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC, Hudson Holdings, LLC, Lanrick Contractors, LLC, Lanrick Real Estate, LLC, Thomas P McKellar, Southeast Dirt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(pp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7802155) filed by Cleartrac, LLC, Russell Kent Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Cleartrac, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Russell Kent Moore(pty:pla).(McDonald, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #8 Exhibit A) (mp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). (Attachment 7 replaced on 8/14/2019) (pp). Modified text on 8/14/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleartrac, LLC et al v. Lanrick Contractors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanrick Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanrick Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Holdings Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Dirt, LLC
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. McKellar
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleartrac, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Kent Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr.
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?