Meunier v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin P. Meunier
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12141
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Arthur Kittridge Smith, III. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Letter) (sbs)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur K. Smith (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7864982) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Colorado-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Simon, Louis)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Attorney Louis Simon, II added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft).(Simon, Louis) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (clw).
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Warshauer, Irving)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (cg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7802983) filed by Justin P. Meunier, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.)Attorney Irving Jay Warshauer added to party Justin P. Meunier, M.D.(pty:pla).(Warshauer, Irving)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meunier v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin P. Meunier
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Naquin
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittridge Smith, III
Represented By: Louis Simon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?