Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company et al v. Colt Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Alabama Great Southern Railway Company
Defendant: Lee Henderson, Colt Inc. and Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12152
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/17/19. (ko)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Alabama Great Southern Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slater, Benjamin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Slater, Benjamin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Colt Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Slater, Benjamin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Colt Inc., Lee Henderson, Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Colt Inc., Lee Henderson, Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Horn, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Lee Henderson filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Horn, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Colt Inc. filed by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company re #1 Complaint,. (Horn, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7804487) filed by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Elizabeth Swingle Horn added to party Norfolk Southern Railway Company(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Swingle Horn added to party The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company(pty:pla).(Horn, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company et al v. Colt Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Slater, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Great Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Slater, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?