Scieneaux v. Jefferson Parish Sewerage Department
Plaintiff: Lawrence Scieneaux
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Sewerage Department and Jefferson Parish
Case Number: 2:2019cv12154
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Jefferson Parish.(Luning, Carolan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that a preliminary conference is hereby SCHEDULED in this matter on 10/29/2019, at 10:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Parties who wish to participate in the conference by telephone may do so by contacting the undersigned magistrate judges chambers at 504-589-7630 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/26/2019.(caa)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave/Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Plead be and it is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant, Jefferson Parish, has through October 10, 2019 to respond to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/26/2019. (sa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time to Plead by Jefferson Parish. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave of Court to File Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, #2 Proposed Pleading Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, #3 Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Plead)Attorney Carolan D. Luning added to party Jefferson Parish(pty:dft).(Luning, Carolan) Modified text on 9/26/2019 (pp).
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jefferson Parish served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (McGovern, Glenn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jefferson Parish. (pp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7805291) filed by Lawrence Scieneaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit P-1, EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit P-2, Right to Sue Letter, #4 Exhibit P-3, Investigation Report, #5 Summons Request Attorney Glenn Charles McGovern added to party Lawrence Scieneaux(pty:pla).(McGovern, Glenn) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (pp). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/15/2019) (pp). Modified text on 8/15/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scieneaux v. Jefferson Parish Sewerage Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Scieneaux
Represented By: Glenn Charles McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Sewerage Department
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Carolan D. Luning
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Carolan D. Luning
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?