Odom v. Sevin et al
Plaintiff: Devin R. Odom
Defendant: Erica Sevin, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office, Jared Rich, Stephen Landry, Dillon Condetti, Dakota Fitch and Aaron Henry
Case Number: 2:2019cv12160
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dillon Condetti, Jared Rich, Erica Sevin, Dakota Fitch, Aaron Henry, Stephen Landry served 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sbs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Spears Hearing held on 9/17/2019. The plaintiff was sworn to provide testimony regarding the nature of his claim. The proceeding was recorded. Plaintiff is advised that if he is transferred or released from custody, he must notify theClerk of Court in writing of his new address and telephone number. (caa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dakota Fitch served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (sbs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Dillon Condetti, Dakota Fitch, Aaron Henry, Stephen Landry, Jared Rich, Erica Sevin, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office. Attorney William F. Dodd added to parties Dillon Condetti(pty:dft), Dakota Fitch(pty:dft), Aaron Henry(pty:dft), Stephen Landry(pty:dft), Jared Rich(pty:dft), Erica Sevin(pty:dft), Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office(pty:dft).(Dodd, William) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (sbs).
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dillon Condetti served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Aaron Henry served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Stephen Landry served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Jared Rich served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Erica Sevin served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sbs)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING SPEARS HEARING: Spears Hearing by Telephone set for 9/17/2019 at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. The Warden is directed to have theplaintiff, DEVIN R ODOM #102724, made available by telephone for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on August 28, 2019. (cc: Warden)(mp)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dillon Condetti, Dakota Fitch, Aaron Henry, Stephen Landry, Jared Rich, Erica Sevin, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (via USMS w Pauper Order & Complaint)(mp)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $12.94 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Devon R. Odom in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff is transferred to another facility or released from custody, the Sheriff, Warden, or authorized prison official shall notify the Court of the inmates new facility or forwarding address within 30 days of the inmate's transfer or release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on August 27, 2019. (cc: Sheriff/Warden)(mp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devin R. Odom. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Erica Sevin, Dakota Finch, Stephen Landry, Aaron Henry, Jared Rich, Dillon Condetti, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office filed by Devin R. Odom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet; (2) Original Deficient Complaint)(sbs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/5/2019. (sbs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devin R. Odom. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Erica Sevin, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office filed by Devin R. Odom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. Sevin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin R. Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Sevin
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Rich
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Landry
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Condetti
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Fitch
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Henry
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?