Jackson v. Hiller Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicole R Jackson
Defendant: The Hiller Companies, Inc. and Hiller Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12175
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 4/28/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Hiller Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landin, Alexander)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference utilizing the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Hiller Companies, Inc. (Landin, Alexander) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (jls).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Hiller Companies, Inc. By the Clerk. (jls)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 19-7172 "F"7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7809278) filed by The Hiller Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Alexander C. Landin added to party The Hiller Companies, Inc.(pty:dft).(Landin, Alexander) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hiller Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hiller Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander C. Landin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiller Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander C. Landin
Represented By: Stephen Mark Klyza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole R Jackson
Represented By: Pamela W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?