Lester v. Beacon Hospital Management, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Lester
Defendant: Beacon Hospital Management, Inc. and Beacon Behavioral Hospital New Orleans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12195
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Beacon Behavioral Hospital New Orleans, Inc., Beacon Hospital Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Robert)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Beacon Behavioral Hospital New Orleans, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Landry, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Beacon Hospital Management, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Landry, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Beacon Behavioral Hospital New Orleans, Inc., Beacon Hospital Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7809736) filed by Michelle Lester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Robert Broussard Landry, III added to party Michelle Lester(pty:pla).(Landry, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Beacon Hospital Management, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Hospital Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Behavioral Hospital New Orleans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lester
Represented By: Robert Broussard Landry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?