Nichols v. Jefferson Parish Correctional Center, et al
Plaintiff: Eric Darrell Nichols
Defendant: Jefferson Parish, Ryan Fanguy and Jefferson Parish Correctional Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv12212
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's #4 Complaint against the Jefferson Parish Correctional Center be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against Detective Ryan Fanguy be STAYED. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of Court be directed to mark this action CLOSED for statistical purposes. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court retain jurisdiction over the stayed claims and that the case be restored to the trial docket upon plaintiff's motion once his criminal proceedings are concluded, so that the claims may proceed to final disposition. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 10/4/2019.(ajn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld: Spears Hearing held on 10/1/2019. (caa)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: A Spears Hearing is hereby SCHEDULED for Tuesday, 10/1/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Plaintiff shall participate via telephone with the Magistrate Judge's office initiating the call. The Warden of the Jefferson Parish Correctional Correctional Center is hereby ORDERED to have Eric Darrell Nichols, #20394010, made available by telephone for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/10/2019. (cc: Warden)(ajn)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $18.58 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Eric Darrel Nichols in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/5/2019. (CC: Sheriff)(ajn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Darrell Nichols. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Original Motion)(cg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Ryan Fanguy, Jefferson Parish Correctional Center filed by Eric Darrell Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/9/2019. (cg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Darrell Nichols. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (cg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Ryan Fanguy, Jefferson Parish, Jefferson Parish Correctional Center filed by Eric Darrell Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Jefferson Parish Correctional Center, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Fanguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Darrell Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?