Wells v. Turlich et al
Plaintiff: Chris Wells
Defendant: Egan Medical Staffing, LLC, Orbon Tinson, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr., Denise Narcisse and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv12218
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Preliminary Conference held on 10/10/2019. During the conference, counsel orally consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28:636(c). A written form of consent is currently being circulated among the parties. A scheduling order setting pretrial, trial and other deadlines will be entered upon receipt of a fully executed consent form. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be exchanged no later than November 7, 2019. Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/10/2019. (NEF: Section F) (sa)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Chelsea Carroll Champagne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/8/19. (ko)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Delahoussaye, Gary)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Champagne, Chelsea)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Champagne, Chelsea) Modified on 10/4/2019 (clw).
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Chelsea Carroll Champagne added to party Egan Medical Staffing, LLC(pty:dft).(Champagne, Chelsea) Modified on 10/4/2019 (clw).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Denise Narcisse, Orbon Tinson, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr.(Martiny, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference by telephone is hereby SCHEDULED in this matter on OCTOBER 10, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The purpose of the conference is to determine if all parties consent to proceed before a magistrate judge pursuant to 28:636(c), and to plan future proceedings and set dates and deadlines, if appropriate. Counsel for the parties are directed to contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers at 504-589-7630 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/11/2019.(sa)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the answer due date for Egan Medical Staffing, LLC is extended through October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/11/2019. (sa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re ** #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Rec. Doc. #6 was filed in error, and re-filed at Rec. Doc. #7 . ** #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (sa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Delahoussaye, Gary) Modified text/submission on 9/11/2019 (sa).
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR, Re-Filed at Doc. 7** MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Egan Medical Staffing, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)Attorney Gary J. Delahoussaye added to party Egan Medical Staffing, LLC(pty:dft).(Delahoussaye, Gary) Modified on 9/11/2019 (sa).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr., Sheriff of Plaquemines Parish, Orbon Tinson and Denise Narcisse, be and are hereby granted a twenty (20) day extension of time from which to file responsive pleadings to the #1 Complaint filed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/29/2019. (mmv)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Denise Narcisse, Orbon Tinson, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Denise Narcisse(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Orbon Tinson(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Gerald A. Turlich, Jr(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Egan Medical Staffing, LLC, Denise Narcisse, Orbon Tinson, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (sa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7812057) filed by Chris Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Galen M. Hair added to party Chris Wells(pty:pla).(Hair, Galen) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Turlich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egan Medical Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Chelsea Carroll Champagne
Represented By: Gary J. Delahoussaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbon Tinson
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald A. Turlich, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Narcisse
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Wells
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?