Robinson v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Robinson
Defendant: Floyd Baker, Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. and Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv12219
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Request for Summons Issued, #13 Request for Summons Issued.** Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section H.** (am)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc, Floyd Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am).
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am). Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am).
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am).
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (am).
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/4/2019) (am). Modified on 9/4/2019 (am).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/30/2019.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and H)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued, #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not include page 2 of summons form. Clerk issued summons and attached a copy of page 2 of form. Please upload complete form on future summons requests.** (jeg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Floyd Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Page 2 of Summons)(jeg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7812192) filed by Antonio Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Dale Edward Williams added to party Antonio Robinson(pty:pla).(Williams, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Represented By: Chad A. Danenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?