Nachar v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Oussama Nachar
Defendant: Sun Life Financial Services Company, Inc. and Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2019cv12229
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark E. Schmidtke. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Schmidtke (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7887086) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration of Mark E. Schmidtke, #3 ECF Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Welch, Lauren) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (clw).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot, Defendant's #6 Motion to Substitute Exhibit. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/27/19. (dno)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,or in the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #8 Notice of Submission)(Welch, Lauren)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Exhibit by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Welch, Lauren)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Dismiss Case by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Notice of Submission)(Welch, Lauren) Modified on 9/24/2019 (jeg).
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Welch, Lauren)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Sun Life Financial Services Company, Inc. (pp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, case number 795775 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7815098) filed by Sun Life Financial Services Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lauren A. Welch added to party Sun Life Financial Services Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Welch, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachar v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Financial Services Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Lauren A. Welch
Represented By: Mark E. Schmidtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oussama Nachar
Represented By: Julie U. Quinn
Represented By: Justin E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?