Blake Marine Group, LLC v. Dat Ha et al
Plaintiff: Blake Marine Group, LLC
Defendant: Talisman Casualty Insurance Company and Dat Ha
Case Number: 2:2019cv12249
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Talisman Casualty Insurance Company.(Hassinger, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/30/2019. (ecm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Talisman Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Timothy William Hassinger added to party Talisman Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hassinger, Timothy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Talisman Casualty Insurance Company served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Garner, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dat Ha, Talisman Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dat Ha, Talisman Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7816637) filed by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Dat Ha, #3 Summons to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company)Attorney John Steven Garner added to party Blake Marine Group, LLC(pty:pla).(Garner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake Marine Group, LLC v. Dat Ha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Marine Group, LLC
Represented By: John Steven Garner
Represented By: John A. Scialdone
Represented By: Laurence R. DeBuys, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talisman Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy William Hassinger
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Schepens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dat Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?