Citadel Recovery Services, LLC v. T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Citadel Recovery Services, LLC
Defendant: T.J. SUTTON ENTERPRISES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12271
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. (ko)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/30/19. (ko)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Schepens, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ellis, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A--AECOM Citadel Contract, #3 Exhibit B--Bonds, #4 Exhibit C--Citadel TJ Sutton Subcontract, #5 Notice of Submission)Attorney Timothy William Hassinger added to party T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft).(Hassinger, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ellis, Robert) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (jls).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Plaintiff submit briefing regarding the citizenship status of Plaintiff Citadel Recovery Services, LLC and Defendant T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC by 8/26/2019 at 5:00 p.m. or before any action of this court is requested. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/23/2019.(jls)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC. (jls)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. ****Filing attorney did not convert the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons form completely prior to filing. When docket clerk reviewed the documents, the information on the forms was able to be edited. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has replaced the images with pdf images that cannot be edited.** (jls)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Declaratory Relief and Damages against T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7820948) filed by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Robert J. Ellis, Jr added to party Citadel Recovery Services, LLC(pty:pla).(Ellis, Robert) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (jls). (Attachments 1 and 2 replaced on 8/23/2019) (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citadel Recovery Services, LLC v. T.J. Sutton Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. SUTTON ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Timothy William Hassinger
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Schepens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citadel Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Ellis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?