Boudreaux v. Bossier et al
Plaintiff: Edward J Boudreaux, Jr.
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, J. Melton Garrett, CBS Corporation, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Zenaca, Inc., Jacobs Constructors, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Dow Chemical Company, J. E. Merit Constructors, Inc., E I Dupont De Nemours & Co Inc, BASF Corporation, Travelers Insurance Company, General Electric Company, McCarty Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Valero H2 Pipeline Company, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr, McDermott, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Payne & Keller Company of Louisiana, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Anco Insulations Inc, Turner Industries Group LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's London, Payne & Keller Company, Inc., One Beacon Insurance Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Zeneca Inc, Avondale Industries, Inc. and Frentex Enterprises of Texas
Cross Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC, J E Merit Constructors, Inc and Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc. and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2019cv12355
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND REASONS STAYING CASE - Before the Court is a Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 10) filed by Plaintiff Edward J. Boudreaux Jr. The Court concludes that staying this case is the most efficient course of action at this time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until the Fifth Circuit issues its opinion in Latiolais v. Huntington Ingalls, Inc., No. 18-30652. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/24/2019.(cg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(ko)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/16/19. (ko)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Memorandum In Opposition to Motion to Remand by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order , #2 Proposed Pleading , #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (cg).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 10) set for October 23, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Motion will be considered on the briefs unless the Court instructs the parties otherwise. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/15/2019.(cg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Clerk re #11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Pursuant to Local Rule 78.1, this motion is set for hearing with oral argument on 10/23/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Carl J. Barbier.(cg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Edward J Boudreaux, Jr. regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cheek, Lindsey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Edward J Boudreaux, Jr.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Cheek, Lindsey)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 1447(b) by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Volume 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Volume 2, #3 State Court Pleadings Volume 3, #4 State Court Pleadings Volume 4, #5 State Court Pleadings Volume 5)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:crc).(Trapolin, Edward)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Burg, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Matthew Burg on behalf of Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Burg added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Burg added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Burg, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/11/2019 (cg).
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Trapolin, Edward)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L Bossier, Jr, Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk.(am)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-11961 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7829990) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L Bossier, Jr, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:crc), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pp), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Bossier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Melton Garrett
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Victor M. Dantin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenaca, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Randy James Marse
Represented By: Jacques Charles Mestayer
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Wheeler
Represented By: Lauren Raili Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. E. Merit Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Dupont De Nemours & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Rodney Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: E. Stuart Ponder
Represented By: Natasha Z. Wilson
Represented By: Thomas J. Cortazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero H2 Pipeline Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Victor M. Dantin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott, Inc.
Represented By: Madeleine Fischer
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Travis Layne Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne & Keller Company of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Jamie Hebert Baglio
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Margaret M. Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Palermo
Represented By: Cynthia Cleland Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's London
Represented By: James R. Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne & Keller Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Robinson
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Dawn R. Tezino
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Inc
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frentex Enterprises of Texas
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Robinson
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Palermo
Represented By: Cynthia Cleland Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: J E Merit Constructors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?