Caballero v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Mae Caballero
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Turner Industries Group, LLC, J. Melton Garrett, J E Merit Constructors, Inc, CBS Corporation, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Zenaca, Inc., Jacobs Constructors, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Dow Chemical Company, E I Dupont De Nemours & Co Inc, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, BASF Corporation, Avondale Industries, Inc., Travelers Insurance Company, General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Valero H2 Pipeline Company, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr, McDermott, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Payne & Keller Company of Louisiana, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Anco Insulations Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's London, Zeneca Inc, Frentext Enterprises Company of Texas and Jacobs Field Services North America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc. and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2019cv12356
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(jls)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The Court will consider defendants' opposition memorandum attached to the instant motion as the final and only response to plaintiffs' motion to remand to state court. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/16/2019. (jls)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Memorandum In Opposition to Motion to Remand by Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (jls).
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Carrie Mae Caballero, subject to further Court Order. At this time, the Court will consider Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand on the parties' briefings. If it later appears to the Court that oral argument would be helpful, it will be ordered. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/1/2019.(jls)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Carrie Mae Caballero regarding #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cheek, Lindsey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carrie Mae Caballero. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Cheek, Lindsey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 1447(b) by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Volume 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Volume 2, #3 State Court Pleadings Volume 3, #4 State Court Pleadings Volume 4, #5 State Court Pleadings Volume 5)(Trapolin, Edward)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Appearance. ** Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. Clerk has accepted the filing and all listed attorneys have been added as counsel of record, considering the Court is awaiting all state court documents per the directive issued at doc. 4. No further action is necessary.** (jls)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Burg, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Matthew Burg on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Burg added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Burg added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Burg, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section B and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. No further action necessary.** (pp)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (pp).
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (jls)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-11966 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7830194) filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:crc), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pp), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Melton Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J E Merit Constructors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenaca, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Dupont De Nemours & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Rodney Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero H2 Pipeline Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Travis Layne Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne & Keller Company of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Jamie Hebert Baglio
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Margaret M. Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's London
Represented By: James R. Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Inc
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frentext Enterprises Company of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Field Services North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Mae Caballero
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?