In Re: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Donald Caillouet
Trustee: U.S. Trustee and S. J. Beaulieu, Jr.
3Rd Party Defendant: Uptown Insurance Agency
Cross Defendant: GeoVera Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12442
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Withdraw GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company's #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. This Court finds that GeoVera's Motion to Withdraw the Reference from Bankruptcy Court and/or Motion to Transfer (Doc. 1) is moot based on the September 27, 2019 Order from the United States Bankruptcy Court in EDLA granting GeoVera's Motion to Retain Jurisdiction in the bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/2/2019.(ecm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw As Moot Geovera's Motion to Withdraw the Reference by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Schudmak, Shaundra) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (am).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw/Transfer shall be SET for submission for October 9, 2019. All responses shall be filed in accordance with local rules. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 09/09/2019.(am)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Bankruptcy, #2 U.S. Bankruptcy, #3 U.S. Bankruptcy)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Donald Caillouet
Represented By: Edwin Mark Shorty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shaundra Marie Schudmak
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Benjamin Warren Kadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: S. J. Beaulieu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uptown Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GeoVera Insurance Company
Represented By: Shaundra Marie Schudmak
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Benjamin Warren Kadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?