Fagan v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Fagan
Defendant: United Fire & Indemnity Company, United States Fire Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv12451
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 12/10/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dno)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas, United States Fire Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Remondet, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United States Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax US Inc. for United States Fire Insurance Company (Remondet, Michael) Modified text on 9/26/2019 (jeg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shawn Fagan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Acosta, Tomy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Decker Truck Line, Inc. (Remondet, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, OCTOBER 17, 2019, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will initiate the call By Clerk.(jeg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas, United States Fire Insurance Company.(Remondet, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (pp).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas, United States Fire Insurance Company re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Entire State Court Record, #2 State Court Pleadings)(Remondet, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas, United States Fire Insurance Company. (pp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th JDC, St. John the Baptist Parish, case number 74262 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7840465) filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, Decker Truck Line, Inc., James Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)Attorney Michael J. Remondet, Jr added to party Decker Truck Line, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Remondet, Jr added to party James Thomas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Remondet, Jr added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Remondet, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagan v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decker Truck Line, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Fagan
Represented By: Tomy J. Acosta
Represented By: Dean Thomas DeFrancesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?