Prince v. Mclain et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Prince
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Co., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Connor Mclain
Case Number: 2:2019cv12484
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #10 Status Conference previously scheduled for 10/29/2019 is HEREBY RESET to 11/14/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. Parties shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 28, 2019.(mp)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #9 Status Conference previously scheduled for 10/30/2019 is HEREBY RESET for 10/29/2019 at 9:45 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Parties shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 23, 2019.(mp)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 10/30/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. Parties shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 3, 2019.(mp)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Status Conference set for 10/30/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 2/7/2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge) (ko)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal/Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Connor Mclain, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(DeRouen, Patrick) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mp).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Appearance. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Also, filing attorney incorrectly selected himself as the filer. Correct filer is State Farm Mutual Automotive Insurance Company. Clerk took corrective actions. (mp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance by State Farm Mutual Automotive Insurance Company on behalf of All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Attorney Patrick Dominic DeRouen added to party Connor Mclain(pty:dft).(DeRouen, Patrick) Modified text/relation on 9/13/2019 (mp).
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal.(mp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-7204 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7843571) filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Patrick Dominic DeRouen added to party State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Co.(pty:dft).(DeRouen, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Mclain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Co.
Represented By: Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Jude Seemann
Represented By: Matthew James Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Represented By: Laurie Lee DeArmond
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Mclain
Represented By: Christopher Jude Seemann
Represented By: Matthew James Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Represented By: Laurie Lee DeArmond
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Prince
Represented By: Robert Andrew Davis
Represented By: James C. Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?