Howard v. Krull, et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Howard
Defendant: Sandra Krull, EAN Holdings, LLC and ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12501
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by ACE American Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Culotta, Anthony) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (sbs).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by ACE American Insurance Company.(Culotta, Anthony)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b).(clw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th Judicial District Court Parish of St. John, case number 74184 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7845839) filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Verification, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Anthony Jacob Culotta, Jr added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Culotta, Anthony) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/10/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/10/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/10/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Krull, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Krull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Jacob Culotta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?