Bilello v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: Denise V Bilello
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Shell Oil Company and Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12520
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/22/19. (ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Remand Letter) (ko).
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shell Oil Company, Denise V. Bilello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guillory, Daniel) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (am).
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in opposition to Motion filed by Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #8 Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing the Disbursement of Funds by Civil District Court from Registry and Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Remaining Claims to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Bryon, Kevin) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (am).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear on October 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction is established under 28 U.S.C. 1335 when the funds that are the subject of the interpleader have not been deposited into this Court's registry. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/11/2019.(clc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing the Disbursement of Funds by Civil District Court from Registry and Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Remaining Claims to State Court by Denise V Bilello, Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Drouant, Robert) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (am).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Response/Reply.**1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the text. **2. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 3. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Shell Oil Company to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guillory, Daniel) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (am).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (clw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Guillory, Daniel) Modified text/linkage on 9/18/2019 (clw).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shell Oil Company. By the Clerk.(am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-10352 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7848186) filed by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Attorney Daniel P. Guillory added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:intpld).(Guillory, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilello v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Daniel P. Guillory
Represented By: Katherine C. Mannino
Represented By: Errol J. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Janell M. McFarland-Forges
Represented By: Kevin Cramer O'Bryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise V Bilello
Represented By: Robert Wayne Drouant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?