In Re: FlyGlo, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: David Adler
Defendant: Corporate Flight Management, Inc. and Air Carrier Management Company, LLC
Debtor In Possession: FlyGlo, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12545
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/9/2019. (cg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by David Adler re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference . (Laudumiey, Fernand)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER reagarding #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw Reference to Bankruptcy Court (Rec. Doc. 1) is SCHEDULED for submission on October 9, 2019, without oral argument. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, the parties must file any memoranda in opposition at least eight (8) days prior to the submission date, or by Tuesday, October 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/19/2019.(cg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Air Carrier Management Company, LLC, Corporate Flight Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Letter)(Judge Jerry A Brown)(cg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: FlyGlo, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: FlyGlo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Flight Management, Inc.
Represented By: Leo David Congeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Carrier Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Leo David Congeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Adler
Represented By: Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?