J.C. Cheek Contractors, Inc. v. Circle, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: J.C. Cheek Contractors, Inc
Defendant: Circle, L.L.C. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12562
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by J.C. Cheek Contractors, Inc. (Pelleteri, Maura)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed By Clerk.(bwn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Cerise, Charles)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Circle, L.L.C. (Cerise, Charles)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Circle, L.L.C., Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Cerise, Charles)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 10/2/2019. (NEF: Judge Wilkinson)(ajn)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Circle, L.L.C. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company answers due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/1/2019. (sbs)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Circle, L.L.C., Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Charles A. Cerise, Jr added to party Circle, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles A. Cerise, Jr added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Cerise, Charles)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Circle, L.L.C. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Pelleteri, Maura)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Pelleteri, Maura)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Circle, L.L.C., Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Circle, L.L.C., Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7851587) filed by J.C.Cheek Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons to Circle, LLC, #4 Summons to Hartford Fire Ins. Co.)Attorney Maura Zivalich Pelleteri added to party J.C.Cheek Contractors, Inc. (pty:pla).(Pelleteri, Maura) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. Cheek Contractors, Inc. v. Circle, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Cheek Contractors, Inc
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Catherine Sens Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?