McTague v. Field et al
Plaintiff: Brian Mctague, Jr.
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, Hertz Vehicles LLC, Sean Field and Sean M. Field
Case Number: 2:2019cv12565
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr. to be substituted in place of Lucia G. Hawks by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Donovan, James) Modified on 11/8/2019 (jeg).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Robert W. Booksh, Jr for Brian McTague, Jr. Attorney Gerald James Leydecker terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/9/19. (ko)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert W. Booksh, Jr. to be substituted in place of Gerald J. Leydecker. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D Judge Wendy B. Vitter and Magistrate 5 Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. No further action necessary. (jeg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert W. Booksh, Jr. to be substituted in place of Gerald J. Leydecker by Brian McTague, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Modified text on 10/9/2019 (jeg).
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by United Financial Casualty Company.(Foote, Jason)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. **1. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary. 2. Attachments 1 and 3 were improperly described. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Notice of Submission instead of typing the name of the attachment when attaching the Certificate of Filing of State Court Record and the List of Parties to the main document. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United Financial Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for United Financial Casualty Company (Foote, Jason) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (jeg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 List of Parties)(Foote, Jason) Modified text/linkage on 10/2/2019 (jeg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (clw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(clw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 797-829 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7851870) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)Attorney Jason Paul Foote added to party United Financial Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Foote, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2019) (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McTague v. Field et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Jason Paul Foote
Represented By: James D. Caboni-Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Vehicles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mctague, Jr.
Represented By: Robert W. Booksh, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald James Leydecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?