Bank of Louisiana v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Bank of Louisiana
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv12594
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Dober, Andrew) Modified text on 10/24/2019 (clw).
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 **FILED IN ERROR** Memorandum by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dober, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2019 (clw).
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Dismiss Case by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. Attorney Andrew Jared Dober added to party Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation(pty:dft).(Dober, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2019 (clw).
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation of Submission. (Dober, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2019 (clw).
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (sa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Stay Hearing and #9 Motion to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/25/2019. (cbs)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Stay Hearing, #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing. Documents do not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate (1). (clw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Arthur)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Hearing by Bank of Louisiana. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Lemann, Arthur)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (sa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/16/2019.(jls) (NEF: Case Mgrs. Sects. B & F, F Chambers)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (pp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7855323) filed by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Statement, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)Attorney Arthur Anthony Lemann, IV added to party Bank of Louisiana(pty:pla).(Lemann, Arthur) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2019) (pp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/16/2019) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Louisiana v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Louisiana
Represented By: Arthur Anthony Lemann, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Jared Dober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?