Worley Claims Services, LLC v. Elite Investment Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Defendant: Elite Investment Group, LLC
Petitioner: Girod Titling Trust
Case Number: 2:2019cv12626
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention filed by Girod Titling Trust. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date is reset for December 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Wendy B. Vitter. (fmm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention by Girod Titling Trust. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading)Attorney Brett Page Furr added to party Girod Titling Trust(pty:intv).(Furr, Brett) Responses due by 12/9/2019 (mmv).
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: on 10/23/2019 re #9 MOTION To Incorporate and Utilize Discovery. WCS and Elite are to serve full and complete supplemental discovery responses on each other under the caption of this case. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (dw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elite Investment Group, LLC filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC.(Kilgore, C.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC re #9 MOTION To Incorporate and Utilize Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kilgore, C.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kilgore, C.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: ORDERED that #11 Amended Complaint be STRICKEN from the record for failure to adequately allege the citizenship of the parties for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. 1332. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Worley Claims Services, LLC, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/11/2019.(jeg)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: Oral argument on Defendants Motion to Incorporate and Utilize Discovery Requests and Responses #9 will be held on 10/23/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 10/7/2019.(caa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 **STRICKEN per order rec doc 13** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elite Investment Group, LLC filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC.(Kilgore, C.) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jeg).
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION To Incorporate and Utilize Discovery. **1. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. 2. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 10/23/2019. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION To Incorporate and Utilize Discovery by Elite Investment Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/23/2019. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Douglas, Donald) Modified text/referral/ submission date on 10/4/2019 (jeg).
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elite Investment Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Douglas, Donald) Responses due by 10/14/2019 (mmv).
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Worley Claims Services, LLC by Elite Investment Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2015 lease)Attorney Donald C. Douglas, Jr added to party Elite Investment Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Douglas, Donald)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/19/19.(ko)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Elite Investment Group, LLC. (pp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Elite Investment Group, LLC filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Kilgore, C.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by Worley Claims Services, LLC of related case(s) 18-9985. (Kilgore, C.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elite Investment Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7857096) filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney C. Parker Kilgore added to party Worley Claims Services, LLC(pty:pla).(Kilgore, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worley Claims Services, LLC v. Elite Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Represented By: Donald C. Douglas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Represented By: C. Parker Kilgore
Represented By: Henry Steven Rauschenberger
Represented By: Justin J. Marocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Girod Titling Trust
Represented By: Thomas Coulter McMahen
Represented By: Vincent V. Tumminello, III
Represented By: Brett Page Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?