Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. v Girod Loanco, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Defendant: Girod LoanCo, LLC and Regina B Heisler
Not Yet Classified: Regina Heisler
Case Number: 2:2019cv13099
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regina B Heisler. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Klein, Henry) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (pp).
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Enforce Judgment. **Memorandum should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary.** (pp)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Girod LoanCo, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Lockridge, James) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/6/2019) (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #7 Memorandum in Support) (pp).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Michael G. Bagneris for Regina Heisler. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/1/19. (ko)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Michael G. Bagneris. **Case caption incorrect. The case caption of all future filings should remain as pleadings were captioned in state court.** (jls)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Michael G. Bagneris by Regina B Heisler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klein, Henry)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case(s) by Regina B Heisler of related case(s) 18-02522 and 19-13150. (Klein, Henry) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (pp).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **1. The filing has the incorrect caption. All future pleadings must have the correct caption or they will be deemed deficient. 2. Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/18/19. (NEF: Chief Judge Brown, Judge Guidry)(ko)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Regina B Heisler re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Klein, Henry) Modified text/linkage on 10/18/2019 (mm).
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Klein, Henry)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **The State Court Pleadings should have been filed as a separate attachment to the Notice of Removal instead of one main document. Clerk took corrective action by separating the State Court Pleadings and attaching them to the Notice of Removal.** (mm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Regina B Heisler. By the Clerk. (mm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
October 12, 2019 Filing fee paid from Regina B Heisler re #1 Notice of Removal (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7902445) (Klein, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-04693 C-10 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Regina B Heisler. Attorney Henry L. Klein added to party Regina B Heisler(pty:pla).(Klein, Henry) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2019) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #1 State Court Pleadings) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. v Girod Loanco, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Regina Heisler
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girod LoanCo, LLC
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Jill A. Gautreaux
Represented By: David J. Halpern
Represented By: James Eric Lockridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina B Heisler
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Represented By: Michael G. Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Landis
Represented By: Donna Phillips Currault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?