Baudy et al v. Adame et al
Plaintiff: Iris Matthews, Ronald Baudy, Sr., Elvin Green, Edward Henderson and Ronald J Baudy, Sr
Defendant: Trish Adame, Federal Employees First Alliance, Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company and Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13345
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #15 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and the submission date is Continued to 1/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/17/2019.(ajn)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and (7) and that the submission date is Continued to 1/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/17/2019.(ajn)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Ronald J Baudy, Sr, Elvin Green, Edward Henderson, Iris Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mobley, Larry)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Ronald J Baudy, Sr, Elvin Green, Edward Henderson, Iris Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mobley, Larry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Corporation, Corporate Parent Nationwide Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Nationwide Life Insurance Company for Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Whitworth, Adam) Modified text to add corporate parents (ajn).
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and (7). **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. The correct date is 1/8/2020. Clerk took corrective action.*** (ajn)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Substitute and Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company is substituted in the place of Nationwide Life Insurance Company; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Nationwide Life Insurance Company is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/25/2019. (ajn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and (7) by Trish Adame, Federal Employees First Alliance. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit h, #10 Notice of Submission)(Belleau, Ashley) Modified text on 11/27/2019 to correct submission date (ajn).
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and (7) by Trish Adame, Federal Employees First Alliance. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Notice of Submission)(Belleau, Ashley) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (am).
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Whitworth, Adam)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute and Dismiss Without Prejudice by Nationwide Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Adam D Whitworth added to party Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company(pty:selreq).(Whitworth, Adam)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, up to and including 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/6/2019. (ajn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Trish Adame, Federal Employees First Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Belleau, Ashley)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Nationwide Life Insurance Company is granted an extension of time within which to file responsive pleadings up to and including 11/25/19. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/1/19. (ko)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Nationwide Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fagan, George)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
October 30, 2019 Filing fee received from Belleau, Ashley L.:Receipt 053L-7929523 $ 400 (cc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 19-10385 (Fee previously paid) filed by Federal Employees First Alliance, Trish Adame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C and D, #2 Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b), #3 Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #4 State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ashley L. Belleau added to party Federal Employees First Alliance(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley L. Belleau added to party Trish Adame(pty:dft).(Belleau, Ashley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/30/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baudy et al v. Adame et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Matthews
Represented By: Alex S Aughtry
Represented By: Larry E. Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Baudy, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Green
Represented By: Alex S Aughtry
Represented By: Larry E. Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Henderson
Represented By: Alex S Aughtry
Represented By: Larry E. Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Baudy, Sr
Represented By: Alex S Aughtry
Represented By: Larry E. Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Adame
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Employees First Alliance
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Adam D Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?