Scott v. Gateway Mortgage Group
Plaintiff: Catrice Scott
Defendant: Gateway First Bank and Gateway Mortgage Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv13358
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Response/Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Gateway Mortgage Group re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Jason) Modified event/linkage/ text on 11/29/2019 (mm).
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (clw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orleans Parish Civil District Court, case number 2019-10769 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7930037) filed by Gateway First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Jason R. Smith added to party Gateway First Bank(pty:dft).(Smith, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Gateway Mortgage Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrice Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway First Bank
Represented By: Jason R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Mortgage Group
Represented By: Jason R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?