Richard v. Jefferson Parish Public School Board
Plaintiff: Raychell Richard
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Public School Board and Jefferson Parish School Board
Case Number: 2:2019cv13544
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Parish Public School Board. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Olden C. Toups, Jr added to party Jefferson Parish Public School Board(pty:dft).(Toups, Olden)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jefferson Parish Public School Board on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Wilson, Whitney)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jefferson Parish Public School Board (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7946897) filed by Raychell Richard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Whitney Morgan Wilson added to party Raychell Richard(pty:pla).(Wilson, Whitney) Modified on 11/13/2019 (clw). SERVICE WILL BE ACCOMPLISHED THROUGH WAIVER

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Jefferson Parish Public School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Public School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish School Board
Represented By: Michael George Fanning
Represented By: Brad James Gegenheimer
Represented By: Olden C. Toups, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raychell Richard
Represented By: Whitney Morgan Wilson
Represented By: Ravi K. Sangisetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?