Johnson v. Louisiana Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Jules Johnson
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Corrections and Warden Hooper
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2019cv13554
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah S Vance
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Attorney General's Office on 12/16/2019.(mm)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on St. John the Baptist Parish Clerk on 12/13/2019, St. John the Baptist Parish District Attorney serve on (No Date). (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(mm)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/12/2019. (jls)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for St. John the Baptist Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/11/2019.(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #1 Return Receipts for Mailing of HC Response Order) (sa).
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Stanley Jules Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(mm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Stanley Jules Johnson. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mm)
December 11, 2019 Filing fee paid from Stanley Jules Johnson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) (mm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Stanley Jules Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stanley Jules Johnson. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Stanley Jules Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/4/2019. (mm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Stanley Jules Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Louisiana Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Jules Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?