Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Heine
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: William Heine
Case Number: 2:2019cv13647
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 motion is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file responsive pleadings is extended 21 days, through and including January 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/06/2020. (am)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines to File Responsive Pleadings. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and removed submission date. (clw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines to File Responsive Pleadings by William Heine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Paul Matthew Jones added to party William Heine(pty:dft).(Jones, Paul) Modified text on 1/6/2020 (clw). Modified event on 1/7/2020 (am).
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Transamerica Corporation, Corporate Parent Aegon International B.V., Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation, Corporate Parent Aegon N.V., Corporate Parent Aegon Trust for Transamerica Life Insurance Company, and Affiliate Euronext Amsterdam (Geary, Covert) Modified text on 12/11/2019 (sa).
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; William Heine served on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 (Geary, Covert) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (am).
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; William Heine served on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Geary, Covert) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (am).
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Heine. (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Geary, Covert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Heine (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7973795) filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Geary, Covert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Heine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Heine
Represented By: Paul Matthew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Covert J. Geary
Represented By: Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?