Akeem et al v. Dasmen Residential, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laquinta Carter, Brandy Wilson, Duplessis Dareranica, Joshua Akeem, Dwayne Pierce, Janis Morgan and Dareranica Duplessis
Defendant: Eastlake Development, LLC, Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, Wilshire Insurance Company, Unidentified Party and KFK Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13650
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Martin LC Feldman
3 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Bergeron, Nicholas)
January 7, 2020 Filing 42 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Bergeron, Nicholas) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (am).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendants KFK Group, Inc. and KFK Development, LLC shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, or up to and including January 23, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/3/2020. (mm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by KFK Group, Inc., KFK Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party KFK Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft).(Waguespack, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 39 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer **Document has been marked filed in error as filing party does not appear as party to this matter.** (clc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 38 **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) Modified on 12/23/2019 (clc).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jonathan M. Walsh,Cassie E. Preston,Victoria J. Cvitanovic for Eastlake Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019. (clw)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, that the #31 Motion is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new submission date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Doc. #23 ] is January 30, 2020. Opposition memoranda shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019.(am)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #30 motion is GRANTED, and Defendant, Eastlake Development, L.L.C., shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, or up to and including January 7, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by by Plaintiffs, Joshua Akeem, Brandy Wilson, Janis Morgan, Laquinta Carter, Dwayne Pierce, and Dareranica Duplessis. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Eastlake Development, LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively MOTION for Summary Judgment . (am)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019. (am)
December 17, 2019 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Jonathan M. Walsh (#25922), Cassie P. Gailmor (#33319), and Victoria J. Cvitanovic (#36520) by Eastlake Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brien, Andrew) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (am).
December 17, 2019 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohren, Tucker) (Main Document 31 replaced on 12/18/2019) (am).
December 17, 2019 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages by Eastlake Development, LLC. (Brien, Andrew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Eastlake Development, L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by Eastlake Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Brien, Andrew) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (am).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr,Matthew Landry on behalf of Joshua Akeem, Laquinta Carter, Dareranica Duplessis, Janis Morgan, Dwayne Pierce, and Brandy Wilson. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/16/2019. (clc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans.**Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately.** (am)
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #22 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record, #23 MOTION to Remand.**Attorney(s) listed on pleading has not been enrolled in this case. If attorney, DeVonn Jarrett, intends to be co-counsel of record, a motion to enroll should be filed. Signature block should only reflect attorneys that have made appearances. Any future filings which list attorneys not enrolled in this case will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Joshua Akeem, Laquinta Carter, Dareranica Duplessis, Janis Morgan, Dwayne Pierce, Brandy Wilson regarding #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(am)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #20 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. If, at a later date, the Court finds that oral argument would be helpful, counsel will be notified. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/13/2019.(am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans by Joshua Akeem, Laquinta Carter, Dareranica Duplessis, Janis Morgan, Dwayne Pierce, Brandy Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Amended Petition), #3 Exhibit B (State Court Docket), #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Statement of Request for Oral Argument, #7 Proposed Order Oral Argument)Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Joshua Akeem(pty:pla), Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Laquinta Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Dareranica Duplessis(pty:pla), Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Janis Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Dwayne Pierce(pty:pla), Attorney Walter John Leger, Jr added to party Brandy Wilson(pty:pla).(Leger, Walter) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (am).
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Walter J. Leger, Jr. and Matthew S. Landry by Joshua Akeem, Laquinta Carter, Dareranica Duplessis, Janis Morgan, Dwayne Pierce, Brandy Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagneris, Emile) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (am).
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . **Document has been marked filed in error as filing party does not appear as party to this matter.** (clc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Eastlake Development, LLC regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively MOTION for Summary Judgment (Brien, Andrew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gustave A. Fritchie, III added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Fritchie, Gustave) Modified on 12/12/2019 (clc).
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion.** Document contains incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section "M" District Judge Barry W. Ashe and Magistrate JudgeDana M. Douglas. ** (am)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit)(Bagneris, Emile)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Andrew J Brien for Eastlake Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/03/2019. (am)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Andrew J. Brien by Eastlake Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, David) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (am).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/26/2019. (NEF: Section "M", MAG-1, MAG-3)(cbs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eastlake Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent KFK Development, L.L.C. for Eastlake Development, LLC (Waguespack, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Andrew J. Brien and David J. Scotton by Eastlake Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, David) Modified on 12/2/2019 (clc).
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eastlake Development, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #5 Notice of Submission)(Waguespack, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Copper Creek, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by RH Copper Creek, LLC, Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (clw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. Additionally, attachment 1 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (clw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-10207 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7974379) filed by RH Copper Creek, LLC, Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Copper Creek, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Eastlake, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2019) (clw). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/15/2019) (clw). Modified text on 11/15/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akeem et al v. Dasmen Residential, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquinta Carter
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Wilson
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duplessis Dareranica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Akeem
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Pierce
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Morgan
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dareranica Duplessis
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastlake Development, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Cassie E. Preston
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: Victoria J. Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dasmen Residential, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RH Copper Creek, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RH Eastlake, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFK Development, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: David Scotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Tabitha Robertson Durbin
Represented By: Mary Kerrigan Dennard
Represented By: Dakota Kyle Chenevert
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFK Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: David Scotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?