Barnes-Dillon v. About You Sitting Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Barnes-Dillon
Defendant: Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson and About You Sitting Service, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13702
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants, About You Sitting Service, LLC; Robert Conley; and Andrea Richardson are hereby granted a thirty (30) day extension of time from which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/17/2019. (ecm)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by About You Sitting Service, LLC, Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party About You Sitting Service, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Robert Conley(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Andrea Richardson(pty:dft).(Richardson, Richard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am).
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am).
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am).
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am).
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am).
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert W. Cowan for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/21/2019. (ecm)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie Rose McGregor for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Cowan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7987038) by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Barrett)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katie R. McGregor (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7987004) by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Barrett)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to About You Sitting Service, LLC, Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7979896) filed by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons About You Sitting Service, LLC, #4 Summons Andrea Richardson, #5 Summons Robert Conley)Attorney Barrett Beasley added to party Patricia Barnes-Dillon(pty:pla).(Beasley, Barrett) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). Modified text on 11/19/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes-Dillon v. About You Sitting Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Conley
Represented By: Richard Allard Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Richardson
Represented By: Richard Allard Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: About You Sitting Service, LLC
Represented By: Richard Allard Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Barnes-Dillon
Represented By: Barrett Beasley
Represented By: Katie Rose McGregor
Represented By: Robert W. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?