Bellina v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deborah Bellina
Defendant: Liberty Personal Insurance Company, Jason Johnston and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13711
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Reply to Response to Motion. **This is a duplicate filing of document 18 and will be noted as such. Document was already filed at record document 18 per the order at record document 17. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 **DUPLICATE DOCUMENT-DOCUMENT FILED AT REC. DOC. 18 PER ORDER AT REC. DOC. 17** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Deborah Bellina re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Lea, Paul)
January 15, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jason Johnston re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (clw)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/15/2020. (clw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Deborah Bellina re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (clw)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/15/2020. (clw)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: rec. doc. 10 by Jason Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodart, Mark) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (mm).
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Record Document 8. **1. Incorrectly titled Proposed Pleading was filed. A corrected Proposed Pleading was subsequently provided to the Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. 2. The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document. 3. Attachment 2 had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Record Document 8 by Deborah Bellina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Lea, Paul) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/14/2020) (mm). Modified text on 1/14/2020 (mm).
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Motion/Incorporated Memo reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand by Deborah Bellina. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lea, Paul) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (mm).
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Deborah Bellina re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lea, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Liberty Personal Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Lorio, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jason Johnston. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Mark Charles Dodart added to party Jason Johnston(pty:dft).(Dodart, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 1/15/2020. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deborah Bellina. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" STPSO - Personal Service report of Jason Johnston, #3 Notice of Submission)(Lea, Paul) Modified submission date on 12/17/2019 (mm).
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deborah Bellina. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" STPSO - Personal Service report of Jason Johnston)(Lea, Paul) Modified text on 12/17/2019 (mm).
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Liberty Personal Insurance Company.(Lorio, Patrick) Modified linkage on 11/26/2019 (mm).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Liberty Personal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Personal Insurance Company (Lorio, Patrick) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (mm).
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by Liberty Personal Insurance Company. (Lorio, Patrick) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (mm).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish, case number 19-15161 E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7981889) filed by Liberty Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party) Attorney Patrick J. Lorio added to party Liberty Personal Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Lorio, Patrick) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellina v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick J. Lorio
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Johnston
Represented By: Mark Charles Dodart
Represented By: Lillian Marie Grappe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bellina
Represented By: Paul A. Lea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?