Belmar, et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: O-Sheaka Williams and Fred Belmar
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Alfred Tait, Jr. and Dillard-Lewis, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13790
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge) (ko)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Dillard-Lewis, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Alfred Tait, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ROS PIIC, #2 Exhibit ROS DL)(Vasser, Claude) Modified linkage on 12/10/2019 (mm).
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Issued by the Clerk on 12/6/2019.(mm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corporation as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Dillard-Lewis, Inc., Alfred Tait, Jr. By the Clerk. (mm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Alfred, Jr. Tait.(Vasser, Claude)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dillard-Lewis, Inc. (Vasser, Claude)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corporation for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Vasser, Claude) Modified text/Corporate Parent on 11/25/2019 (mm).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 19-03086 C-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAEDC-7992020) filed by Alfred, Jr. Tait, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Dillard-Lewis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit - Citation PIIC, #3 Exhibit - Summons Citation Dillard, #4 Exhibit - Citation Tait, #5 State Court Pleadings - Answer w Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit Request for citation, #7 Exhibit - Citation reissued to Tait, #8 Affidavit SOP on Tait, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party Dillard-Lewis, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party Alfred, Jr. Tait(pty:dft).(Vasser, Claude) Modified text on 11/25/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmar, et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O-Sheaka Williams
Represented By: Jennifer R. Rust
Represented By: David J. Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Ellen Kerstin Baggett
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: Craig S. Leydecker
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Belmar
Represented By: Jennifer R. Rust
Represented By: David J. Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Ellen Kerstin Baggett
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: Craig S. Leydecker
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Tait, Jr.
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard-Lewis, Inc.
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?