Boyd et al v. Drug Fighter Enterprises
Plaintiff: Glen T. Boyd and Parker Boyd
Defendant: Drug Fighter Enterprises and Lycoming
Not Yet Classified: Lycoming Engines, a Division of AVCO Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv13803
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. IT IS ORDERED that Lycoming's Motion to Quash Service and Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #4 ) shall be SET for submission on August 19, 2020. (am)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Joint Motion to Continue Submission Date and Request for Status Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date for Lycoming's Motion to Quash Service and Dismiss (Rec. Doc. #4 ), currently set for January 15, 2020, is CONTINUED to be reset at a status conference with the Court; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an in person status conference with counsel for Plaintiffs and Lycoming is SET on January 8, 2020 at 2:30p.m. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/31/2019.(am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Request for Status Conference.**Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Request for Status Conference by Lycoming, Glen T. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeCompte, Brian) Modified text/filers on 12/30/2019 (am).
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Response/Reply by Lycoming to #3 Order Clerk's Directive (LeCompte, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash Service and Dismiss by Lycoming. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Brian Hudson Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission)(LeCompte, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. Issued by the Clerk.(am)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish case number 19-10756 D(12) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7992473) filed by Lycoming Engines, a Division of AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Brian Michael LeCompte added to party Lycoming Engines, a Division of AVCO Corporation(pty:selreq).(LeCompte, Brian) Modified text on 11/27/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. Drug Fighter Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Fighter Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming
Represented By: Brian Michael LeCompte
Represented By: Marshall Thomas Cox
Represented By: Francis Horatio Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Lycoming Engines, a Division of AVCO Corporation
Represented By: Brian Michael LeCompte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen T. Boyd
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Boyd
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?