LeBlanc et al v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Leblanc and Ronnie LeBlanc
Defendant: Forest River, Inc., Berryland Motors, L.L.C. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13948
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Berryland Motors, L.L.C..Attorney Mark R. Pharr, III added to party Berryland Motors, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Pharr, Mark)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to U.S. Bank, N.A. on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Pharis, Fred)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Berryland Motors, L.L.C. on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Pharis, Fred)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Forest River, Inc. answer due 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/12/2019. (cg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Forest River, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael R. Rahmn added to party Forest River, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rahmn, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Berryland Motors, L.L.C., Forest River, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Berryland Motors, L.L.C., Forest River, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. filed by Ronnie LeBlanc, Amy Leblanc re #1 Complaint,. (Pharis, Fred)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Pharis, Fred)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Civil Cover sheet not provided. Please file Civil Cover Sheet. (cg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7998431) filed by Ronnie LeBlanc, Amy Leblanc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Fred A. Pharis added to party Ronnie LeBlanc(pty:selreq), Attorney Fred A. Pharis added to party Amy Leblanc(pty:selreq).(Pharis, Fred) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/27/2019) (cg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/27/2019) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc et al v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Rahmn
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berryland Motors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark R. Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Leblanc
Represented By: Fred A. Pharis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie LeBlanc
Represented By: Fred A. Pharis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?