Vincent v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: William S. Vincent, Jr.
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv14078
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William S. Vincent, Jr (Kleinman, Randall)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Kleinman, Randall) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (jls).
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (clw)
December 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kleinman, Randall)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons, and document was blank. Please provide proper summons for issuance. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. (dw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William S. Vincent, Jr (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8009295) filed by William S. Vincent, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Randall L. Kleinman added to party William S. Vincent, Jr(pty:pla).(Kleinman, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Vincent, Jr.
Represented By: Randall L. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?