Modica v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Deborah Modica
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv14464
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8018585) filed by Deborah Modica. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Deborah Modica(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modica v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Modica
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?