Becnel et al v. Lamorak Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: james P. becnel, James P Becnel, Sheila Becnel Eschete, Jacqueline D Becnel, Jimmy P Becnel and James P Becnel, Jr
Defendant: Eagle Inc., National Automative Parts Association, Turner Industries Group LLC, CBS Corporation, Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Uniroyal, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Volkswagon Group of America Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Pope's Parts Inc., BMW of North America LLC, Fisk Electric Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, Old Carco LLC, International Paper Company, Gulf Engineering Company, LLC, Lamorak Insurance Company, American Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association, LLC, BMW of North America, LLC and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Cross Defendant: International Paper
3Rd Party Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2019cv14536
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. The Court will consider defendants' supplemental case authority in support of the Avondale interests' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remand. While acknowledging courtesies here, but to save trees and avoid needless expansion in the record, a simple reference with citation to another court's potentially relevant opinion and holding will suffice in the future. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/31/2020. (ko)
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Melancon, David) Modified on 2/3/2020 (pp).
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/21/2020. (ko)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 Supplemental Memorandum filed by American Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company, in Opposition of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/21/2020. (ko)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Response to Sur-Reply)(Clement, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Melancon, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (jls)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/10/2020. (jls)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(Clement, Jonathan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(clw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020 per Order filed at Rec. Doc. 23: #8 Exhibit) (ko).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/3/2020. (clw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (pp).
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30)(Clement, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company,identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, identifying Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE. (Dietz, Julia) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (pp).
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (pp)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-7596 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8020832) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pp).(Melancon, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/13/2019) (jls). Modified text on 12/17/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becnel et al v. Lamorak Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automative Parts Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Palermo
Represented By: Cynthia Cleland Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Kassie Lee Richbourg
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagon Group of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope's Parts Inc.
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisk Electric Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Wheeler
Represented By: Donald J. Miester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Carco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Engineering Company, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Insurance Company
Represented By: Julia Ann Dietz
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: International Paper
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: james P. becnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Becnel
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Becnel Eschete
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline D Becnel
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy P Becnel
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Becnel, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?