E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. v. Donna J. Bouchard M/V et al
Plaintiff: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.
Defendant: Barge B. NO. 272, Donna J. Bouchard M/V and Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: Bouchard Transportation, Tug Donna J Bouchard Corp and B No 272 Corp
Intervenor Plaintiff: Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC, Crescent Towing & Salvage Co., Inc., Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. and Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv14666
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Tug Donna Bouchard Representative and Morton Bouchard to Appear at Hearing by Telephonet by Donna J. Bouchard M/V. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Morton Bouchard, #3 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc..Attorney Robert Hugh Murphy added to party Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Murphy, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Barge B. NO. 272, Donna J. Bouchard M/V.(Murphy, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Emergency MOTION to Compel Tug Donna. J. Bouchard Corp. and or the Declarant Mr. Morton S. Bouchard, III to Appear and Show Cause Why the Substitute Custodian has Failed to Fulfill its Obligation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that an emergency hearing will be held on the 18th day of February, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. at the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, 500 Poydras Street, Courtroom C316, New Orleans, LA 70130; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Tug Donna J. Bouchard Corp. ("Donna Bouchard Corp.") shall appear at such emergency hearing and show cause why Donna Bouchard Corp. has failed to fulfill its obligations as substitute custodian in this case; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Morton S. Bouchard, III shall appear at such emergency hearing and show cause why Donna Bouchard Corp. has failed to fulfill its obligations as substitute custodian in this case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Main Document 33 replaced on 2/14/2020) (bwn).
February 13, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/13/2020. The Court discussed with the parties the pending #30 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. (bwn)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephone status conference will be held on the 13th day of February, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. to discuss Plaintiff E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.'s #30 Emergency Motion To Compel Tug Donna Bouchard Corp. and/or the Declarant Mr. Morton S. Bouchard, III To Appear and Show Cause Why the Substitute Custodian Has Failed To Fulfill its Obligations. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION to Compel Tug Donna. J. Bouchard Corp. and or the Declarant Mr. Morton S. Bouchard, III to Appear and Show Cause Why the Substitute Custodian has Failed to Fulfill its Obligation by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart) Modified on 2/13/2020 to edit docket text (bwn).
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(clw)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/12/2020. (clw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 27 OBJECTIONS by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. to Extension of Answer Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peck, Stewart)
January 27, 2020 Filing 26 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC.(sbs)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/27/2020. (sbs)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention. **Filing attorney referred this motion in error. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. ALSO, filing attorney entered incorrect submission date. Correct submission date is 2/19/2020. ALSO, the Notice of Submission provided names the incorrect Judge that will be hearing the motion. Please be sure the Notice of Submission reflects the correct information for all future filings.** (sbs)
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave for Intervention by Louisiana Machinery Company, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order )Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Louisiana Machinery Company, L.L.C.(pty:mov).(Peck, Stewart) Modified text, added filer on 1/27/2020 (sbs).
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Proposed Pleading Affidavit, #6 Proposed Pleading Exhibit) Attorney Cary Alan DesRoches added to party Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC(pty:mov).(DesRoches, Cary) Modified text, removed referral, adjusted submission date on 1/27/2020 (sbs).
January 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Donna J. Bouchard M/V and/or Verified Statement of Right or Interest. (Murphy, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Barge B. NO. 272 and/or Verified Statement of Right of Interest. (Murphy, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/15/2020. (3CC: USM) (sbs)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Insurance Verification, #3 Proposed Order)(Thurman, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Proof of Public Notice & Arrest by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Copy of Notice)(Thurman, James) Modified text on 1/9/2020 (sbs).
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc., Crescent Towing & Salvage Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Verification)(am)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to File Intervention. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/26/2019. (am)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by Crescent Towing & Salvage Co., Inc., Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Verification, #5 Certificate of No Opposition, #6 Proposed Order) Attorney Kevin M. Frey added to party Crescent Towing & Salvage Co., Inc.(pty:mov), Attorney Kevin M. Frey added to party Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc.(pty:mov).(Frey, Kevin) Modified text and filers on 12/20/2019 (sbs).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion Allowing Movement & Repairs of Vessels. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/18/2019. (3 cc USM on vessel, 3 cc USM on barge) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/18/2019. (3 cc USM on vessel, 3 cc USM on barge) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 WRIT of Foreign Attachment issued on Barge B No. 272. (3 cc USM) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 WRIT of Foreign Attachment issued on M/V Donna J. Bouchard. (3 cc USM) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest issued on Barge B No. 272. (3 cc USM) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest of M/V Donna J. Bouchard issued. (3 cc USM) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/18/2019. (3 cc USM on vessel, 3 cc USM on barge) (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc. (clw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION Permission To Move and Repair Vessels by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barge B. NO. 272, Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc., M/V Donna J. Bouchard (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8032510) filed by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Donna J. Bouchard Info, #2 Exhibit Barge B. NO. 272 Info, #3 Exhibit Invoices, #4 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.(pty:pla).(Peck, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. v. Donna J. Bouchard M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.
Represented By: James Wesley Thurman
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge B. NO. 272
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna J. Bouchard M/V
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bouchard Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tug Donna J Bouchard Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: B No 272 Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC
Represented By: James Wesley Thurman
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Crescent Towing & Salvage Co., Inc.
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc.
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Robert Emmet Couhig, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, III
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Pastorek
Represented By: Cary Alan DesRoches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?