E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. v. Bouchard Girls M/V et al
Plaintiff: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.
Defendant: Bouchard Girls M/V, Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., Barge B. NO. 295 and Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.
Intervenor: Force Power Systems, LLC, Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC and Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv14765
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 34 WARRANT of of Arrest issued. Arrest of M/V Bouchard Girls. Arrest of Barge B. NO. 295. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest)(jeg) (3cc: USM)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion to Issue Warrant of Arrest. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Clerk of Court is authorized to issue a Warrant of Arrest of the Vessels M/V BOUCHARD GIRLS and the Barge B. NO. 295, which are currently located within this District, as prayed for in the Verified Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/19/2020. (jeg) (3cc: USM)
February 19, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (mmv)
February 14, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc..Attorney Robert Hugh Murphy added to party Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Murphy, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Barge B. No. 295, Bouchard Girls M/V.(Murphy, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: A Status Conference was held on 2/14/2020. The Court and counsel discussed the status of the case. (jeg)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #27 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The parties shall appear for a status conference in chambers on Friday, February 14, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/13/2020. (dwd)
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause why the Substitute Custodian has Failed to Fulfill its Obligations by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion To Appoint Substitute Custodian, #2 Exhibit Email Exchange, #3 Exhibit COTP Order, #4 Exhibit Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit Complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (jeg).
February 12, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issue Warrant of Arrest by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(DesRoches, Cary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. to Extension of Answer Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Peck, Stewart)
February 11, 2020 Filing 24 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Verification)(cg) (3cc: USM on 2/20/2020 (jeg)).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Intervene. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral hearing set on February 12, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 2/11/2020. (cg)
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC, Force Power Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jeg)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Intervene FURTHER ORDERED that the Intervenors be and hereby are granted leave to intervene in the instant matter as plaintiffs-in-intervention. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/10/2020. (jeg)
January 31, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Intervene by Louisiana Machinery Co., L.L.C., Force Power Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney James Wesley Thurman added to party Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC (pty:mov), Attorney James Wesley Thurman added to party Force Power Systems, LLC(pty:mov).(Thurman, James) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (jeg).
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by B. No. 295 Corp and/or Verified Statement of Right or Interest. (Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (jeg).
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Bouchard Girls Corp and/or Verified Statement of Right or Interest. (Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (jeg).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Oral Hearing on #16 MOTION to Intervene. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention [Doc. #16] is SET FOR ORAL HEARING before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on Wednesday, February 12, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom B305 at 500 Poydras St. (Hale Boggs Federal Bldg.), New Orleans, Louisiana. Any memorandum in opposition and any reply memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 1/15/2020.(cg)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney Cary Alan DesRoches added to party Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC(pty:intvp).(DesRoches, Cary)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/14/2020. (jeg)(3CC: USM)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Insurance Information, #3 Proposed Order)(Thurman, James)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. Proof of Public Notice and Arrest. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Publication of Notice of Action & Arrest of Vessels, #2 Exhibit Copy of Notice)(Thurman, James) Modified text on 1/14/2020 (jeg).
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issue Warrant of Arrest by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DesRoches, Cary) Modified on 1/13/2020 (jeg).
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 **DEFICIENT** Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Cary Alan DesRoches added to party Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC(pty:selreq).(DesRoches, Cary) Modified on 1/13/2020 (jeg).
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.. (mp)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest issued. Arrest of M/V Bouchard Girls. Arrest of Barge B. NO. 295. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant)(3cc's to USM)(mp)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Permit Movement & Repairs of Vessels. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on December 27, 2019. (mp) (3cc's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on December 27, 2019. (mp) (3cc's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on December 27, 2019. (mp) (3cc's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION Permission To Move and Repair Vessels M/V Bouchard Girls and Barge B. NO. 295 by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart)(3c's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian Blue Marine Security, LLC by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart) (3c's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem against the M/V Bouchard Girls and Barge B. NO. 295 by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart) (3c's to USM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8045779) filed by E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vessel Information, #2 Exhibit Vessel Information, #3 Exhibit Invoices, #4 Exhibit Verifying Declaration, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.(pty:pla).(Peck, Stewart) (3cc's to USM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc. v. Bouchard Girls M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.
Represented By: James Wesley Thurman
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Girls M/V
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge B. NO. 295
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Force Power Systems, LLC
Represented By: James Wesley Thurman
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Robert Emmet Couhig, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, III
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Pastorek
Represented By: Cary Alan DesRoches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Louisiana Machinery Co., LLC
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Represented By: James Wesley Thurman,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?