John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. v Delta Dental Plans Association, et al
Plaintiff: John C. Schwartz, D.D.S, A Professional Corporation and John C. Schwartz, D.D.S.
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental of Colorado, Hawaii Dental Service, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental of Missouri, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Oregon Dental Service, Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental of Minnesota, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., DeltaUSA, Maine Dental Service Corp., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc. and Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00018
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William A. Isaacson. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/10/2020. (mm)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa Brooke Felder Zappala. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/10/2020. (mm)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward Takashima. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/10/2020. (mm)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice W. Isaacson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8138798) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Gankendorff, Edgar)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Zappala (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8138779) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Gankendorff, Edgar)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Takashima (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8138730) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Gankendorff, Edgar)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Takashima (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8133708) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Gankendorff, Edgar) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice W. Isaacson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8133701) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Gankendorff, Edgar) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Zappala (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8133657) by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Gankendorff, Edgar) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding the formation of an MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/16/2020.(mm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM Of Plaintiff Robin Lambert Mells (1) In Opposition to the Motion to Transfer Related Actions to the Northern District of Illinois and (2) In Support of Transfer to and Centralization in the Northern District of California for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(my)(Originally filed by an Interested Party as rec doc 128 in MDL 2931)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint by John C. Schwartz, D.D.S., All Defendants (Gankendorff, Edgar) Modified text/filers on 1/10/2020 (mm).
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8057274) filed by John C. Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Exhibit A) Attorney Edgar Dean Gankendorff added to party John C. Schwartz(pty:pla).(Gankendorff, Edgar) Modified text on 1/6/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John C. Schwartz, D.D.S. v Delta Dental Plans Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plans Association
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Colorado
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Dental Service
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Nebraska
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Virginia
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of California
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of North Carolina
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Iowa
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Missouri
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Rhode Island
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Dental Service
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Minnesota
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of South Dakota
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Washington
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeltaUSA
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Dental Service Corp.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Schwartz, D.D.S, A Professional Corporation
Represented By: Edgar Dean Gankendorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Schwartz, D.D.S.
Represented By: Edgar Dean Gankendorff
Represented By: Henry St. Paul Provosty
Represented By: Edward Takashima
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa Brooke Felder Zappala
Represented By: Eric R.G. Belin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?